Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/08/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/09/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/13/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/16/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/16/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/19/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/19/2012
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/22/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/22/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/26/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/27/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/27/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/28/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/28/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/28/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/29/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/29/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/30/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/30/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/16/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/16/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/16/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/16/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/16/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/16/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/16/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 04/17/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/17/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/18/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/19/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/24/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/24/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/07/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 05/07/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/08/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/09/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/10/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/30/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/30/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/05/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/06/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/26/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/17/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/17/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/17/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/17/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/19/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/19/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/26/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/01/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/11/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/21/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2012