Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13]* 03/07/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/22/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/22/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 03/22/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/27/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/25/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/25/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 04/27/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/27/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 07/09/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/17/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/24/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/31/2012