Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/05/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/16/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/08/2012