Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/08/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/22/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/22/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/16/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/16/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/26/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 05/10/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/18/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/18/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/18/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/18/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/13/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/13/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/13/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/28/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/28/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/02/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/04/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/04/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/04/2012