Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/08/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/19/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/08/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/08/2012
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/08/2012
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/08/2012
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 05/09/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/09/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/09/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/09/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/09/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/09/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 05/09/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/15/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 05/15/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/15/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/15/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 05/15/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/18/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 06/18/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/18/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/18/2012
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/18/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/18/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 06/21/2012