Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/08/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 05/09/2012