Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/28/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/28/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 02/28/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/13/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/13/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/13/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/16/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/16/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/16/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/16/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/19/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/19/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 03/20/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/21/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/22/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/26/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/27/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/29/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/29/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/29/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/16/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/26/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/27/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/07/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/15/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/16/2012
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/30/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/30/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/19/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/28/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/15/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/27/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/27/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/27/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/28/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/18/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 12/19/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 12/27/2012