Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 02/09/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3]* 02/09/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 02/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/16/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 04/17/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/26/2012