Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/08/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/24/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/09/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/18/2012