Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/06/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/07/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/13/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 02/13/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/13/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/16/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/16/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/27/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/27/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/28/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/01/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/07/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/20/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 03/20/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/26/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/26/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 03/27/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/16/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/16/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 04/17/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 05/08/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/09/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/22/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 08/02/2012