Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/25/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 06/25/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/25/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/28/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/29/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/09/2012
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/11/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/23/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/26/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/26/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/26/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 08/01/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 08/02/2012