Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/31/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/01/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/01/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/01/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/01/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/02/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/02/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/02/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/02/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/02/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/02/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/02/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/02/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/02/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/02/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/02/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/02/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/02/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/02/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/06/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/20/2012