Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/31/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 02/02/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 02/02/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/02/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/02/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 02/02/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/02/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/06/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/07/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/13/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 02/15/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/15/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/05/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/13/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/13/2012