Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 01/23/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/08/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/13/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 02/13/2012
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/15/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/15/2012
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/17/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 02/17/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 02/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/29/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/29/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/29/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/29/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/29/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/29/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/06/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/06/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 03/08/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/08/2012
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/08/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/08/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/08/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/08/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/08/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/08/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/21/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/21/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/21/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/22/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/22/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/22/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/22/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/28/2012
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 04/24/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/24/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/09/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/09/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/10/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/15/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/18/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/31/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/05/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/08/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/18/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 06/18/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/18/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 06/18/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/18/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/18/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/18/2012
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/18/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 06/18/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 06/19/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/20/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/21/2012
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/21/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/21/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/21/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/27/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/27/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/27/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/28/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/28/2012
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/28/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/28/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/28/2012
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/29/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/29/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/09/2012
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/09/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/09/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 07/11/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 07/11/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/11/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/11/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/17/2012
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/17/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/18/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/19/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/23/2012
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/23/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/23/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/24/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/26/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 07/26/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/30/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/30/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2012
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/31/2012
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 08/01/2012
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 08/02/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 08/02/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/02/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 08/02/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 08/07/2012
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 08/07/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 09/10/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/10/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/10/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/14/2012
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/14/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/14/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/19/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/27/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/05/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew