Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/18/2012
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 01/18/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 01/18/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/18/2012
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/25/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/25/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/25/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/25/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/25/2012
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/03/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/03/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 02/03/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/03/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/03/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 02/03/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 02/03/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/03/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/03/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/03/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/03/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 02/03/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 02/03/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/21/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/21/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/21/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 02/21/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/21/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/21/2012
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/21/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/21/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/27/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/29/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 02/29/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/06/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/06/2012
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/06/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/06/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/06/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/06/2012
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/07/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/27/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/27/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/07/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 05/07/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 07/11/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/13/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/13/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/13/2012
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/13/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/19/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/19/2012