Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/08/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/08/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/08/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/08/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/08/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/08/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/08/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/17/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/17/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/17/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/14/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/15/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/15/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/16/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/16/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 06/21/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/23/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/23/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/23/2011
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/24/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 06/24/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 07/07/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 07/07/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 08/16/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 08/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/15/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/23/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/23/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/03/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/04/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 10/25/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/04/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/16/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/16/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 11/30/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 12/07/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 12/12/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/18/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/06/2012
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/06/2012
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 02/06/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/14/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/15/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/07/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 03/20/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/20/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/18/2012
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 04/26/2012
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/25/2012