Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 12/19/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 01/17/2012
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 01/19/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/24/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/25/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/01/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/01/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/03/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/03/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/03/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/06/2012
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/07/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/08/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/08/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/14/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 02/14/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/27/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/27/2012
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/27/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 02/29/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/05/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/09/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/16/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/16/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 03/19/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/29/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/23/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 05/08/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/09/2012
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/15/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/16/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/17/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/30/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 06/06/2012
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/06/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/07/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/21/2012
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 06/21/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/26/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 06/26/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/26/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/09/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/17/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/26/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 07/26/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/26/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/11/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/02/2012