Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 01/24/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/24/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/08/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/07/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/29/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/13/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/20/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/12/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/02/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/02/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/01/2011