Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 12/08/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/18/2012
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/18/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 01/18/2012
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 01/18/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/18/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 01/18/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 01/18/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 01/23/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/25/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/25/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/27/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/27/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/31/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 01/31/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/31/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/31/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 02/01/2012
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/01/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/02/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/02/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/03/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/06/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/06/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/07/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/14/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/15/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/17/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/17/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/21/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/21/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/24/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/24/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/24/2012
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/24/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/24/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/27/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/01/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/05/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 03/05/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/06/2012
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/13/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/19/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/19/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/19/2012
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 03/19/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/19/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/20/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/20/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/22/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/26/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/28/2012
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 03/28/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/16/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/16/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/19/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 04/19/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/24/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/25/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/25/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/07/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/07/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/07/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/15/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/30/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/31/2012
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/18/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/18/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/27/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/28/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 07/10/2012
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/10/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/11/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/17/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/17/2012
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/23/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/24/2012
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/24/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 07/26/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/31/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/31/2012
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/31/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/01/2012
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 08/02/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/11/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/11/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/13/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/13/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 11/13/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/13/2012