Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/20/2011
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/20/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 01/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 02/17/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/17/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 02/17/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/17/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 02/17/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 02/17/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 02/17/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/18/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/08/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/21/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 09/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 10/04/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 04/24/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/10/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/19/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 07/31/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/21/2012