Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/07/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 12/08/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/08/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 12/16/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/17/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 01/17/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/17/2012
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/17/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 02/02/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/02/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/06/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/16/2012
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/26/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 07/18/2012
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/18/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 07/18/2012
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/18/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 07/18/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/18/2012
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/18/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/18/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/18/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/18/2012
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 07/18/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/18/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/18/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 07/18/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/18/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/25/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/25/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/26/2012
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/07/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 08/07/2012
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/11/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 09/11/2012
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/11/2012