Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/07/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 12/13/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 12/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/15/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/15/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 12/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/15/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/15/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/15/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 12/15/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 12/16/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 12/19/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/19/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/18/2012
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/18/2012
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/18/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 01/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/18/2012
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/18/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/27/2012
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 01/27/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 01/27/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 01/27/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 01/27/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 01/27/2012
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/27/2012
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 01/27/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 01/27/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 01/27/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/27/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 01/27/2012
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/27/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 01/27/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/27/2012
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/30/2012
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 01/30/2012
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/30/2012
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 01/30/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 01/30/2012