Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large]* 12/01/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 12/01/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/02/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 12/07/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/07/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/12/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/20/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew