Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 11/18/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/06/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/06/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/06/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/07/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/18/2012
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/18/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/25/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/25/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 01/25/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 01/25/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 01/25/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 01/25/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/25/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/25/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/25/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 01/25/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 01/25/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/25/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/01/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 02/01/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/01/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/01/2012
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 02/01/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/2012
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/01/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/01/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/01/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/01/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/01/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/01/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/01/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/15/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2012