Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 11/17/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 11/22/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/22/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/22/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/22/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/22/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 11/22/2011
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/22/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 12/02/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/02/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/02/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/02/2011
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 12/02/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 12/02/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/02/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 12/12/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/12/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/12/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 12/12/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/12/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 12/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/16/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 12/16/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 12/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/16/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/16/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/16/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 12/16/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/19/2011
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/23/2012
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 01/23/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/23/2012
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/23/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/23/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/23/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/23/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/23/2012
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/25/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 01/25/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 01/25/2012
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/07/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/07/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 02/07/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/07/2012
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/07/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 02/07/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/24/2012
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/24/2012
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/24/2012
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/24/2012
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 02/24/2012
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/24/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/01/2012
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 03/01/2012
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/08/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/08/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/20/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/20/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/20/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/20/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/20/2012
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 03/20/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/20/2012
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/20/2012
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/21/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/21/2012
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/21/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/21/2012
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-24] 03/21/2012
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3] 03/21/2012
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 03/22/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/22/2012
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/22/2012
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/26/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 03/26/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/26/2012
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/26/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/26/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/29/2012
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 03/29/2012
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 03/29/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/29/2012
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/29/2012
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/29/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 04/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/18/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 04/18/2012
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 04/18/2012
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/18/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/26/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/26/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 04/26/2012
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/17/2012
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/17/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/07/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/07/2012
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-11] 06/07/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/07/2012
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/07/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/07/2012
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/21/2012
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/21/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/29/2012
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/29/2012
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/25/2012
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/30/2012
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/30/2012
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/30/2012
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/09/2012