Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 11/16/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 11/16/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/18/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/18/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/02/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/02/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/02/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/02/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/02/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/02/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/02/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/07/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/07/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 12/07/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/07/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 12/07/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/07/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 12/07/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/07/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/08/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 12/08/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/08/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/08/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 12/13/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/14/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/14/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/14/2011
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/14/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/20/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/20/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/20/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 12/20/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/20/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/20/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hochul, Kathleen C. [D-NY-26] 12/20/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 12/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 12/20/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/20/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 12/20/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/20/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/20/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/20/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/13/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 02/01/2012
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/01/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 02/01/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/08/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/08/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/28/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/17/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/25/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/10/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/22/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/19/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/02/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/02/2012
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/02/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 08/02/2012