Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/04/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/18/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/13/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/13/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/13/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/01/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/01/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/01/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/01/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/03/2012
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/06/2012
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 02/16/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/01/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/06/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/09/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/19/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/22/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/12/2012