Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 11/04/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 11/15/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 11/15/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/18/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/18/2011
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 11/18/2011
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 11/18/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 11/29/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 12/07/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 01/23/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 02/09/2012
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/09/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 02/28/2012
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 03/08/2012
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 03/21/2012
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 04/25/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 07/25/2012
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 08/02/2012
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/10/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew