Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 11/02/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/03/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/29/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/29/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 12/02/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 12/02/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/02/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 12/02/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/02/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/02/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/08/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/08/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/08/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/08/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/08/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/08/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 12/08/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/08/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/08/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/12/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 12/12/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 12/12/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/12/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 12/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 12/23/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/10/2012
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/23/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/23/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/23/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 01/23/2012
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/23/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/23/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/23/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/23/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/25/2012
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/25/2012
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/25/2012
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 01/27/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/27/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/02/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/02/2012
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 02/02/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/03/2012
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 02/08/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/09/2012
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/09/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/09/2012
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/15/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/24/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/24/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 02/29/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/05/2012
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/05/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/05/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/05/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/05/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/13/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/16/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 03/16/2012
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/21/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/29/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/29/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/29/2012
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/18/2012
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/25/2012
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/27/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/10/2012
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/15/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/15/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/22/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 05/30/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/07/2012
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/12/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/12/2012
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/18/2012
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/20/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/11/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/23/2012
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/24/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 08/07/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/10/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/10/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/12/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/14/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/23/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/23/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/27/2012