Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/26/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/03/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/03/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/03/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/03/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/03/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/14/2011
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 11/14/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/30/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/30/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 12/07/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/07/2011
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 12/12/2011

Show cosponsors who withdrew