Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/18/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/15/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/15/2012
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/15/2012
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/15/2012
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/15/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/15/2012
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 02/28/2012
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/28/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/28/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/06/2012
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/26/2012
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/26/2012
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/26/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/16/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/16/2012
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/16/2012
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/17/2012
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/19/2012
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/07/2012
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/10/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/10/2012
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/16/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/07/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/07/2012
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/07/2012
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/09/2012
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/17/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/17/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/18/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/01/2012
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 08/01/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 08/02/2012
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 08/02/2012
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 08/02/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/11/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/11/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/11/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/11/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/11/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2012
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/12/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2012
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/13/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/13/2012
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/13/2012
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/14/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/14/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/14/2012
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/14/2012
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/19/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/19/2012
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/20/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/21/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/21/2012
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/21/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/21/2012
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/15/2012
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/15/2012
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 11/15/2012
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/15/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/29/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/29/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew