Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/16/2011
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 11/16/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/16/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/07/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/10/2012