Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/12/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/26/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/26/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21] 10/26/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/15/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 11/15/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/17/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 11/22/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/14/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 12/16/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/24/2012
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/23/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/23/2012
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/17/2012
Rep. Buerkle, Ann Marie [R-NY-25] 07/10/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/26/2012
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 12/04/2012