Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/12/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 11/01/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/10/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/10/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/16/2011
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 11/16/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/01/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/19/2012
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/19/2012
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/24/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/24/2012
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/24/2012
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 07/26/2012
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 07/31/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/31/2012