Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 10/05/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 10/05/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/25/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 10/25/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/16/2011
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/13/2012
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/13/2012
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 09/21/2012