Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-21]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/05/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 10/05/2011
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 10/06/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/16/2011
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 11/17/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 12/08/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 12/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 12/14/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/18/2012
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/24/2012
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/16/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/24/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 05/22/2012