Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/06/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/06/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/12/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/12/2011
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/12/2011
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 10/14/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 10/14/2011
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 10/26/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 11/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/15/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/18/2011
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 05/07/2012