Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/04/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/06/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/25/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/25/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/01/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/01/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/01/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/02/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/02/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/15/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/15/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/15/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 12/07/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/07/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 12/20/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/03/2012
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 02/03/2012
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/07/2012
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/07/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/08/2012
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/08/2012
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/08/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/08/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/09/2012
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/09/2012
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2012
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 02/14/2012
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/14/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/14/2012
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/14/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/17/2012
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/17/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/17/2012
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/27/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/27/2012
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/27/2012
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/27/2012
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/27/2012
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/27/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/01/2012
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/07/2012
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/07/2012
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/09/2012
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/09/2012
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/19/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 04/16/2012
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/18/2012
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/18/2012
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/18/2012
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/18/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 05/08/2012
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/17/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/17/2012
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/29/2012
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/29/2012
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/29/2012
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/01/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/07/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/21/2012
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/21/2012
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/12/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew