Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/18/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/18/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/19/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/19/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 01/19/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/19/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/20/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/20/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/20/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/20/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/24/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/24/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/24/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/24/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/24/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/26/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/26/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/10/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/10/2011
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/10/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/10/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/10/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/10/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 02/10/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/10/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/10/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/10/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 02/10/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/15/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/15/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/15/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/15/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/17/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/17/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/17/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/17/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/18/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/18/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/10/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/10/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 03/10/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/14/2011
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/14/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 03/17/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/29/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/29/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/29/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/30/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/06/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 04/06/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 06/03/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/18/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 01/24/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2012
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/24/2012
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/18/2012
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 12/18/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/18/2012
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 12/18/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/18/2012
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 12/18/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/18/2012
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/18/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/18/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/18/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/20/2012
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/20/2012
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/20/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/20/2012
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/20/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/20/2012
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 12/20/2012
Rep. Curson, David Alan [D-MI-11] 12/20/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/20/2012
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 12/20/2012