Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/22/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/23/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/13/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/25/2011
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/25/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 10/31/2011
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 11/29/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/07/2011
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 01/17/2012
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/07/2012
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 02/14/2012
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2012
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/29/2012
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/16/2012
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2012
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/18/2012
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/19/2012
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/24/2012
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/25/2012
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/26/2012
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2012
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/08/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/11/2012
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/15/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 05/15/2012
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/05/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/05/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/12/2012
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/13/2012
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 08/01/2012
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/02/2012
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/18/2012
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/28/2012
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/16/2012
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/14/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/14/2012
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/15/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/16/2012