Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/25/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/25/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/09/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/09/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/09/2011
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/09/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/09/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/09/2011
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/09/2011
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/09/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/10/2011
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 02/10/2011
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/10/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/10/2011
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/10/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/10/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/10/2011
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/11/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/11/2011
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/11/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/15/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 02/17/2011
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/17/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/01/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/01/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/01/2011
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/01/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/03/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/03/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 03/11/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/11/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/14/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/16/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/29/2011
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/31/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/31/2011
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/31/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/06/2011
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/13/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/15/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2011
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/02/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/02/2011
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/02/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/11/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/11/2011
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 06/01/2011
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2011
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/06/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/12/2011
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/18/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 07/25/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/29/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 08/01/2011
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/20/2011
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 09/20/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 10/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2011
Rep. Schilling, Robert T. [R-IL-17] 12/16/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/18/2012
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/15/2012
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/28/2012
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/28/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/29/2012
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 02/29/2012
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/29/2012
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/05/2012
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/05/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/06/2012
Rep. Berg, Rick [R-ND-At Large] 03/06/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/06/2012
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 03/28/2012
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/28/2012
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2012
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 04/16/2012
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 04/25/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/07/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/08/2012
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/27/2012
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 07/11/2012
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/11/2012
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/12/2012
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/24/2012
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/31/2012
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 08/01/2012
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/02/2012
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 08/02/2012
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 08/02/2012
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/20/2012
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/26/2012
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/17/2012