Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/21/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 09/21/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/22/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/04/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/04/2011
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/04/2011
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/14/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/09/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/09/2012