Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Landry, Jeffrey M. [R-LA-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 09/20/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 10/12/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Tim [R-SC-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 10/12/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 10/12/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/17/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/17/2011
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 12/13/2011
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 12/13/2011
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 12/13/2011
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/31/2012
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/31/2012
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 01/31/2012
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/02/2012
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 02/07/2012
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/24/2012
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/07/2012
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/07/2012
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/07/2012
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/28/2012
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 03/28/2012
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 03/29/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/24/2012
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/27/2012
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/16/2012
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-18] 06/06/2012
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-19] 06/07/2012
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/12/2012
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/20/2012
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/21/2012
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 06/25/2012
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/29/2012
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/29/2012
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/29/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 07/30/2012
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/01/2012
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 08/01/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/10/2012