Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/19/2011
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/19/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/19/2011
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/19/2011
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 09/22/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/03/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/04/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 10/04/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/04/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/04/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/04/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 10/05/2011
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 10/06/2011
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/06/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/11/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/11/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/11/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/12/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/24/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/24/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/24/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/25/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/25/2011
Rep. Dold, Robert J. [R-IL-10] 10/25/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/25/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/26/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/01/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/03/2011
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/03/2011
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/03/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 11/03/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/16/2011
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/17/2011
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 11/17/2011
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/18/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/29/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/29/2011
Rep. Turner, Robert L. [R-NY-9] 11/29/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/29/2011
Rep. Hayworth, Nan A. S. [R-NY-19] 11/30/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/30/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/01/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/01/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 12/01/2011
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/01/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 12/02/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/02/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 12/02/2011
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/02/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/06/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/06/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/06/2011
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/06/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/12/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/12/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/12/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/12/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 12/13/2011
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/13/2011
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/13/2011
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/13/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/13/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/13/2011
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/14/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/14/2011
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/14/2011
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 12/14/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/14/2011
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/16/2011
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/16/2011
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/16/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/16/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/16/2011
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/16/2011
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/19/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/19/2011
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/19/2011
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/19/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/19/2011
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 12/20/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/25/2012
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 01/25/2012
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 01/25/2012
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/25/2012
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/25/2012
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/02/2012
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/15/2012
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 04/18/2012
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/24/2012
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25] 04/24/2012
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/18/2012
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/05/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew