Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/15/2011
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/20/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/20/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/05/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-36] 10/05/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/05/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/05/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/05/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/05/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/05/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/05/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/05/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/05/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/13/2011
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/13/2011
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 10/26/2011
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/26/2011
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/26/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 10/26/2011
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/26/2011
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 10/26/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/26/2011
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/26/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/26/2011
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/26/2011
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/26/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/26/2011
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/26/2011
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/02/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/02/2011
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 11/02/2011
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/02/2011
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 11/02/2011
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/02/2011
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 11/02/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-10] 11/02/2011
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/02/2011
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/02/2011
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/02/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/02/2011
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/02/2011
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/03/2011
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/03/2011
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/03/2011
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/14/2011
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/14/2011
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/14/2011
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/14/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Hansen [D-MI-13] 11/14/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/14/2011
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/14/2011
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/14/2011
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/14/2011
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/14/2011
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/17/2011
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/18/2011
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/18/2011
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 11/29/2011
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 11/29/2011
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 12/01/2011
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/02/2011
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/06/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 12/06/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/07/2011
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/14/2011
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/16/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/16/2011
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/19/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 12/19/2011
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/18/2012
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/18/2012
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/08/2012
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/19/2012
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/19/2012
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/09/2012
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 12/03/2012