Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/14/2011
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/14/2011
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/14/2011
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 09/14/2011
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/20/2011
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/20/2011
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/24/2011
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/24/2011
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 10/24/2011
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/25/2011
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 11/17/2011
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/19/2012
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 09/11/2012
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/09/2012