Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/12/2011
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/12/2011
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/13/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/13/2011
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/14/2011
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/14/2011
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/14/2011
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/14/2011
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/14/2011
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/14/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/14/2011
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/14/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 09/15/2011
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/15/2011
Rep. Quayle, Benjamin [R-AZ-3] 09/15/2011
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/15/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/15/2011
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/20/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/20/2011
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/12/2011
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/12/2011
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 10/18/2011
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/26/2011
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/26/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-5] 11/01/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 11/01/2011
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 11/03/2011
Rep. Cravaack, Chip [R-MN-8] 11/03/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8] 11/04/2011
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/04/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/14/2011
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 11/14/2011
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 11/14/2011
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/14/2011
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/14/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/16/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 11/16/2011
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/17/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 11/17/2011
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/29/2011
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 11/30/2011
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/06/2011
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/12/2011
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/16/2011
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 12/16/2011
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 01/23/2012
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/07/2012
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 06/20/2012
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/10/2012
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 09/21/2012
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 11/15/2012