Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/09/2011
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Rivera, David [R-FL-25]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Walsh, Joe [R-IL-8]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-13]* 09/09/2011
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/12/2011
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/05/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 10/11/2011
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/15/2011
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-17] 02/15/2012
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/16/2012

Show cosponsors who withdrew