Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/12/2011
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/12/2011
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/12/2011
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Guinta, Frank C. [R-NH-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. West, Allen B. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2011
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 09/12/2011
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/12/2011
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/12/2011
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/12/2011
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-29] 09/12/2011
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 09/12/2011
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 09/12/2011
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/12/2011
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/12/2011
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8] 09/12/2011
Rep. Adams, Sandy [R-FL-24] 09/14/2011
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/14/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/14/2011
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/14/2011
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 09/14/2011
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/14/2011
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-20] 09/20/2011
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/20/2011
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/20/2011
Rep. Canseco, Francisco "Quico" [R-TX-23] 09/20/2011
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/20/2011
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/22/2011
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 09/22/2011
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 09/22/2011
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 09/22/2011
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/12/2012
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 10/05/2012