Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/09/2011
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/09/2011
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/09/2011
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/14/2011
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/14/2011
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/21/2011
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/21/2011
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/29/2011
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/29/2011
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2011
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/26/2011
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/26/2011